Al Shirawi, Maryam Ibrahim 'Abdullah (CPSO#: 107812)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Oman

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2017