Al Siyabi, Sumaya Mousa Issa (CPSO#: 97128)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Dec 2011 to 14 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013