Al Sulami, Hessah Said Ali (CPSO#: 80189)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 12 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 11 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

Queen's University, 12 Sep 2004 to 11 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

Queen's University, 12 Sep 2005 to 12 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 May 2006