Al Tunaiji, Khalid Mohamed Obaid Khalfan (CPSO#: 78431)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 25 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010