Al Turki, Fawaz Abdullah I (CPSO#: 74171)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003