Al Turkistany, Hanan Qurban Mirza Abed (CPSO#: 80762)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 06 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010