Al Waheibi, Khalifa Nasser Salem (CPSO#: 81505)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006