Al Yahya, Rand Sulaiman W (CPSO#: 106661)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Jun 2015 to 22 Jun 2015
PEAP - Resident - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Jun 2015 to 28 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2015