Al Yousif, Hussain Abdullah Hassan (CPSO#: 107445)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017