Al-Aama, Jumana Yousef Adeeb (CPSO#: 78828)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2004