Al-Abdulaaly, Abdulaziz I A (CPSO#: 70825)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 02 Sep 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1999