Al-Abdulhadi, Osama Abdulwahab Abdulrahman (CPSO#: 80009)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2003 to 01 Sep 2003
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011