Al-Abdulmohsen, Taleb Jawad H (CPSO#: 78687)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2004 to 03 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2004