Al-Abdwani, Raghad Mohamed Redha Hassan (CPSO#: 88278)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 25 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2011 to 25 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015