Al-Absi, Emad Jamil Mah'd (CPSO#: 87356)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009