AlAhmadi, Saeed Mohmmad (CPSO#: 97263)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 23 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014