Al-Ahmed, Nasser Abdulrahman Ahmed (CPSO#: 76849)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 10 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2002 to 10 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2003 to 10 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2004 to 10 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2005 to 10 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2006 to 29 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2006