Al-Aithan, Abdulsalam Matooq M (CPSO#: 85984)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2007 to 28 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Feb 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2009 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009