Al-Ajlan, Saad Mohammad (CPSO#: 85246)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Washington, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011