Al-Ajmi, Abdullah M M M (CPSO#: 78400)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 01 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2003 to 01 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2004 to 01 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2005 to 22 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009