Al-Ali, Hassan Yousif (CPSO#: 100196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: 7054345143
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hassan Al-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Ali ( CPSO# 100196)

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-3377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN YOUSIF AL-ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2016