Al-Alwan, Ibrahim Alwan Abdullaziz (CPSO#: 70761)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 05 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1999