AlAmeel, Turki Abdullah S (CPSO#: 88212)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Apr 2008 to 06 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011