Al-Amri, Ahmed Saeed Ahmed (CPSO#: 77155)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 18 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2001 to 01 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2002 to 01 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2003 to 01 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2004 to 01 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2005 to 01 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2008