AlAnezi, Fahad M A A (CPSO#: 83584)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007