Al-Anezi, Fahad Rifeed Marshed (CPSO#: 87708)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 02 Dec 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2007 to 30 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2010