Al-Anezi, Khaled Hamad M J (CPSO#: 70725)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Jul 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 24 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 25 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003