Al-Aqeel, Aqeel Ibrahim Mohammed (CPSO#: 70733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
86 Kent Street North
Simcoe ON  N3Y 3S4
Phone: (519) 426-8800
Fax: (519) 426-5700
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0750
Fax: (519) 429-6998
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Fax: (905) 768-8670
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aqeel Ibrahim Al-Aqeel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Aqeel ( CPSO# 70733 )

Business Address:
86 Kent Street North
Simcoe ON  N3Y 3S4
Phone Number: (519) 426-8800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AQEEL IBRAHIM MOHAMMED AL-AQEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AQEEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2007