Al-Arnawoot, Amna Salah Abdulqadir (CPSO#: 103251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNA SALAH ABDULQADIR AL-ARNAWOOT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-ARNAWOOT is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL-ARNAWOOT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-ARNAWOOT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-ARNAWOOT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-ARNAWOOT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-ARNAWOOT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018