Al-Asaaed, Sohaib (CPSO#: 88316)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2008 to 21 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013