Al-Ashgar, Hamad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 71027)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1999