Al-Awadh, Emad Dawood Jeman Dawood (CPSO#: 69591)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Jul 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1997