Al-Awadhi, Naser M N SH (CPSO#: 107794)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2015 to 09 Nov 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 10 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2016