Al-Azem, Omar (CPSO#: 105075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1673 Richmond st. North
Unit 4
London ON  N6G 2N3
Phone: 519-951-7178
Fax: 519-951-7953
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Al-Azem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Al-Azem ( CPSO# 105075)

Business Address:
Suite 4
1673 Richmond Street North
London ON  N6G 2N3
Phone Number: (519) 951-7178

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR AL-AZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AZEM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2016