Al-Azzawi, Manaf Kusai Hasan (CPSO#: 62848)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997