AlAzzawi, Nihad Khalid Abbas (CPSO#: 99233)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Aug 2012 to 02 Sep 2012
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 03 Sep 2012 to 14 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014