Al-Bakkal, Sahar (CPSO#: 68085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Damascus, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Emergency Department
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 4L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ahmed & Dr. S. Al-Bakkal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 13 2012


Corporation Name: Dr. Sahar Al-Bakkal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Bakkal ( CPSO# 68085 )

Business Address:
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone Number: (613) 244-2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHAR AL-BAKKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BAKKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998