AlBakri, Ayman Mahmoud Ahmad (CPSO#: 92533)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 23 May 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2012