Al-Bakshy, Faiz Radhi (CPSO#: 67323)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 02 Aug 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 02 Aug 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 1997 to 26 Oct 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 1997