Al-Baldawi, Danya (CPSO#: 97570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Linhaven Nursing Home
403 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5
Phone: 905-934-3364
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Shaver
541 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Canada
Phone: 905-685-1381
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Woodlands of Sunset Nursing Home
920 Pelham Street
Welland ON  L3C 1Y5
Canada
Phone: 905-892-3845
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Extendicare St. Catharines
283 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 688-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

NHS Greater Niagara General Site
Department of Internal Medicine
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 57800
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danya Al-Baldawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Al-Baldawi ( CPSO# 97570 )

Business Address:
403 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5

Business Address:
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Business Address:
920 Pelham Street
Welland ON  L3C 1Y5

Business Address:
283 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANYA AL-BALDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BALDAWI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014