Al-Beladi, Fatma Ibrahim (CPSO#: 80949)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2004 to 09 Jul 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2005