AlBlooshi, Rehab Mohamed Ahmed Ali (CPSO#: 108104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2015

Expiry Date:  31 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 22 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Div of Medical Oncology/Hematology
Room 5-216
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5429
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REHAB MOHAMED AHMED ALI ALBLOOSHI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALBLOOSHI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALBLOOSHI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALBLOOSHI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALBLOOSHI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALBLOOSHI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALBLOOSHI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 May 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2015 to 21 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2018 to 31 May 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2018