Al-Breiki, Danah Hassan Mohd Saleh (CPSO#: 84177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eye Institute
General Campus
501 Chemin Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 739-6805
Fax: (613) 739-6889
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danah Al-Breiki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Al-Breiki ( CPSO# 84177 )
Dr. H. Al-Saffar ( CPSO# 86231 )

Business Address:
Eye Institute
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6805


Corporation Name: Al-Saffar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Al-Breiki ( CPSO# 84177 )
Dr. H. Al-Saffar ( CPSO# 86231 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANAH HASSAN MOHD SALEH AL-BREIKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BREIKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2009 to 15 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2010 to 15 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2012