AlBreiki, Zainab Abdullah Ali (CPSO#: 102788)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2014 to 20 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2014 to 03 May 2014
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2014