AlBuali, Ahmed Abdulwahab A (CPSO#: 89927)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 14 Oct 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 02 Jan 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009