Al-Bugami, Naif Abdullah Naif (CPSO#: 73029)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 26 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 1999 to 26 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2000 to 27 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2001 to 26 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2002 to 26 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2003