AlDabbagh, Mona Abdullah Hussein (CPSO#: 102443)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2013 to 11 Mar 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014