Al-Daheri, Asim Ali Atiyatallah (CPSO#: 92201)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010