Al-Dahery, Abdullah Rageh Atallah (CPSO#: 85643)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2006 to 26 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2006 to 26 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2007