Al-Dawood, Abdulaziz Saad Mohamed (CPSO#: 67794)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000